U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Waters
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 22, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 15, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 16, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 16, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 16, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 15, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 15, 2020: [Consent]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 25, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 18, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 16, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 16, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 15, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 14, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 02, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 21, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 20, 2019: [Furlough]
  • February 04, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 28, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • January 25, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 25, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 16, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 15, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 15, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 15, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 14, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 14, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 11, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 11, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 04, 2019: [Response]
  • January 04, 2019: [In Limine]
  • January 04, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 04, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • January 03, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 03, 2019: [In Limine]
  • January 03, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Notice]
  • December 13, 2018: [Response]
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice]
  • December 07, 2018: [Notice]
  • December 06, 2018: [Notice]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 21, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 27, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 06, 2018: [Reconsideration]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 21, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • March 21, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • March 21, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 06, 2018: [Transcript]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 08, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 31, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • January 31, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 25, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 24, 2018: [Request]
  • January 24, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 24, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 24, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 24, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 24, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 24, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 24, 2018: [Indictment]
  • January 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 23, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.