U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kuehner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Stipulation]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Extend]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Extend]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 23, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • July 11, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2019: [Passport - Return of]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 21, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 20, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 07, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 07, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 06, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 06, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 02, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 23, 2019: [Extend]
  • April 17, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 12, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 14, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 01, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 01, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 01, 2019: [Consent]
  • February 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 01, 2019: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • February 01, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 01, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 18, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 18, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 02, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 30, 2018: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • January 29, 2018: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 29, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 29, 2018: [Request]
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 26, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 26, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 25, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2018: [Arrest]
  • January 25, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.