U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50178-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Twiss
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 15, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 08, 2019: [Extend]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 11, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • October 04, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2018: [Sealed Response to Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 09, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 08, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 08, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 08, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Sealed Response to Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 02, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 02, 2018: [Compel ]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 18, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 27, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 27, 2018: [Consent]
  • April 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 11, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 11, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 11, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 26, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 26, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 25, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 25, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.