U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10009
  • Case Name: Armon Francis Zens
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Service of Final Form]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • October 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • February 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
  • February 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • February 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • March 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • May 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • May 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 18, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • May 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 16, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • May 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 14, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • May 14, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • May 08, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 08, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
  • May 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
  • April 16, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 14, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • April 06, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • February 24, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • February 18, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
May, 2019
  • May 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
October, 2018
  • October 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • July 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
June, 2018
  • June 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • June 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Order Request]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment of Mailing List with Notice]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.