U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cv-05032
  • Case Name: United States of America et al v. National American University et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Order]
  • August 06, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 06, 2020: [Proposed Order]
  • August 06, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 05, 2020: [Stipulation]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Briefing Schedule]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 27, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 16, 2019: [Briefing Schedule]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Text Order]
  • August 22, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
  • August 22, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 20, 2019: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 16, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 16, 2019: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • August 16, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 16, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 09, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • August 09, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 09, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 07, 2019: [Certificate]
  • August 07, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 07, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 07, 2019: [Protective Order]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Reply]
  • June 14, 2019: [Declaration]
  • June 14, 2019: [Response to Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 29, 2019: [Supplement]
  • May 29, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 28, 2019: [Certificate]
  • May 28, 2019: [Compel]
  • May 22, 2019: [Proposed Order]
  • May 22, 2019: [Certificate]
  • May 22, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • February 27, 2019: [Stipulation]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 12, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 03, 2018: [Discovery Report]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 27, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 27, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 27, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • May 16, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 16, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 14, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 04, 2018: [Return of Service]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • April 24, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 31, 2018: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.