U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Citterman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Return of Property]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Return of Property]
  • August 01, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 27, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 27, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 27, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 27, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • July 16, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 13, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 13, 2018: [Case No Longer Referred]
  • July 13, 2018: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • July 13, 2018: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 13, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 13, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 13, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 05, 2018: [Extend]
  • July 02, 2018: [Transcript]
  • July 02, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Brief]
  • May 11, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 09, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 09, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 07, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 04, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 03, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 01, 2018: [Suppress]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 02, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Response]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order]
  • February 14, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 12, 2018: [Request]
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 06, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 02, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 02, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 02, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 02, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 01, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 01, 2018: [Arrest]
  • February 01, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.