U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cr-50017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jeunesse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 18, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 08, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 03, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 09, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 08, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 02, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 02, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 01, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 01, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 01, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 17, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 02, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 23, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 23, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 07, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 19, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 19, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 19, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 19, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 17, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 02, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.