U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Waters
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • November 19, 2020: [Response]
  • November 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 04, 2020: [Supplement]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • October 22, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • October 21, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • October 21, 2020: [Admission]
  • October 16, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 05, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 01, 2019: [Furlough]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 20, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 20, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 20, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 12, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 12, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • March 11, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 11, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 07, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 07, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 07, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 07, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 07, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Consent]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2018: [Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2018: [Consent]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 16, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 16, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 09, 2018: [Request]
  • February 09, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 08, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 07, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 07, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 07, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 07, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 07, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 07, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 05, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 05, 2018: [Arrest]
  • February 05, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.