U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Babb
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 13, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 10, 2018: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • December 10, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 13, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 24, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 14, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 14, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Consent]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 14, 2018: [Discovery]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Request]
  • May 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 16, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 15, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 15, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 15, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 14, 2018: [Bail Report]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 16, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 13, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 06, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 06, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.