U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flute
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 20, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • May 20, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 14, 2019: [Letter]
  • May 10, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 27, 2018: [Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 19, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 05, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 05, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 05, 2018: [Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 21, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 06, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 06, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 24, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • July 24, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 20, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 20, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 14, 2018: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • April 05, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • April 05, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • April 05, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order]
  • March 01, 2018: [Stipulation]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 20, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 16, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • February 16, 2018: [Response]
  • February 14, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 13, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 13, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 12, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 12, 2018: [Request]
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 09, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 06, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • February 06, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 06, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 06, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.