U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Duckworth
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Letter]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 20, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 19, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 13, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 13, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 09, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 09, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 09, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 12, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 17, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 17, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 17, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • June 06, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • June 06, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 06, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 07, 2018: [Discovery]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • February 22, 2018: [Request]
  • February 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 16, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 15, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 15, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 15, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 15, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 08, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 06, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 06, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 06, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.