U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez-Barajas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 10, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 09, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 09, 2018: [Sentencing]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 09, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 07, 2018: [Discovery]
  • March 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • March 02, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • February 06, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 06, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.