U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Feather
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 01, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 21, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 20, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 18, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 26, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 25, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 25, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 13, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 04, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 23, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 13, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 13, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 29, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 21, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 17, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 16, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 11, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • March 11, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 11, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 02, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 28, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 28, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 28, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 28, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 25, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 15, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 05, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 05, 2018: [Sentencing]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 29, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 29, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 23, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2018: [Extend]
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 09, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 09, 2018: [Consent]
  • February 09, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 09, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 09, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 09, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 08, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Summons]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 08, 2018: [Ex Parte Motion for Summons]
  • February 08, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 08, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 08, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 08, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.