U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50028
  • Case Name: Jeremy Del Haskell and Michelle Rae Haskell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
  • June 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
March, 2018
  • March 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan/Modified Plan]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • February 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Creditor List]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • February 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Deadlines]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.