U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aesoph
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • June 04, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 18, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 27, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 27, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 13, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 17, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 28, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 28, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 28, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 19, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 19, 2018: [Consent]
  • June 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 29, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 29, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 29, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • February 13, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 12, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 12, 2018: [Request]
  • February 09, 2018: [Arrest]
  • February 09, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 09, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 09, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 09, 2018: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.