U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-04002
  • Case Name: Pierce v. Reaves
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Receipt of Filing Fee]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Adversary Case]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Dismissal]
  • March 17, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 15, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Clerk's Entry of Default]
  • March 09, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Return of Service ]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Service Executed]
  • February 12, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Issued]
  • February 12, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • February 12, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.