U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-01001
  • Case Name: Hendrickson v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 01, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • March 17, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 15, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • March 15, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • February 19, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • February 12, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 12, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 12, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.