U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Waters
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Appeal Record Returned]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • February 07, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • June 10, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 10, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [USCA Order]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 25, 2021: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • January 25, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 18, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 18, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 17, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 08, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 04, 2020: [Sentencing]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 30, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 09, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 05, 2020: [Consent]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 30, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 30, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 30, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 22, 2020: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 16, 2020: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Notice]
  • September 21, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 16, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 05, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 05, 2020: [Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 02, 2020: [Objection]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • May 19, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • May 07, 2020: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 07, 2020: [Supplement]
  • May 07, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 05, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • May 04, 2020: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • May 04, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • May 01, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 01, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Subpoena(s)]
  • April 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Supplement]
  • March 31, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 23, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 19, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2020: [Subpoena(s)]
  • March 17, 2020: [Extend]
  • March 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice]
  • March 13, 2020: [Certificate]
  • March 12, 2020: [Hearing]
  • March 06, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 06, 2020: [Letter]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 02, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Medical Treatment]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Furlough]
  • February 26, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 25, 2020: [Medical Treatment]
  • February 24, 2020: [Extend]
  • February 21, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 19, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 14, 2020: [Letter]
  • February 11, 2020: [Objection]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 07, 2020: [Extend]
  • February 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 16, 2020: [New Trial]
  • January 13, 2020: [Letter]
  • January 10, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 13, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 13, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Dismiss Count]
  • October 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 08, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 07, 2019: [New Trial]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • August 20, 2019: [Transcript]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 15, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • June 07, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 07, 2019: [Extend]
  • June 03, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 29, 2019: [Order]
  • May 27, 2019: [Order for Return of Exhibit(s)]
  • May 27, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • May 27, 2019: [Verdict]
  • May 27, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • May 27, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • May 27, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • May 24, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 24, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 23, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • May 22, 2019: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • May 21, 2019: [Jury List]
  • May 21, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 21, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • May 17, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 16, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 16, 2019: [In Limine]
  • May 14, 2019: [Supplement]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order]
  • May 10, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 07, 2019: [Supplement]
  • May 07, 2019: [Response]
  • May 07, 2019: [Notice]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice]
  • May 06, 2019: [Response]
  • May 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 06, 2019: [In Limine]
  • May 06, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 03, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 03, 2019: [In Limine]
  • May 03, 2019: [Notice]
  • May 01, 2019: [Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 16, 2019: [Furlough]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Response]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 22, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 20, 2019: [Furlough]
  • February 15, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Extend]
  • December 18, 2018: [Supplement]
  • December 18, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 11, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • December 11, 2018: [Transcript]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • November 20, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • November 14, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 09, 2018: [Extend]
  • November 06, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 01, 2018: [Extend]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 23, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 23, 2018: [Suppress]
  • October 23, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 17, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 17, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 17, 2018: [Suppress]
  • October 16, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 09, 2018: [Request]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 04, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 26, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 22, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 07, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 07, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 26, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 21, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • February 15, 2018: [Add Counts - Indictment]
  • February 14, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • February 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 14, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.