U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nespor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • February 10, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • February 09, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 16, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 11, 2020: [Response]
  • September 09, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 09, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • September 08, 2020: [Extend]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 26, 2020: [Supplement]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 19, 2020: [Extend]
  • August 17, 2020: [Extend]
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 14, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • August 11, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • August 10, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • August 06, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • November 25, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • November 25, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 19, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 10, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 10, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 10, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 01, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • August 14, 2018: [Seal Existing Document]
  • August 14, 2018: [Document Unsealed]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 27, 2018: [Consent]
  • July 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 06, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 06, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 06, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 01, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 23, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 16, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 09, 2018: [Reconsideration]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 21, 2018: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • February 16, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 14, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 14, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • February 14, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • February 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 14, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.