U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Piskule
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Agreement for Pretrial Diversion]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order]
  • October 25, 2018: [Stipulation to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • October 25, 2018: [Statement of Facts in Support of Pretrial Diversion]
  • October 25, 2018: [Order for Pretrial Diversion]
  • October 25, 2018: [Agreement for Pretrial Diversion]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 08, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order]
  • March 21, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • March 12, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 02, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 02, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 02, 2018: [Response]
  • March 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 01, 2018: [Request]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 01, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 01, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 01, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 01, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 01, 2018: [Arrest]
  • March 01, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 01, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 01, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 01, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 01, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.