U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marshall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 28, 2022: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 17, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 08, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 07, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 04, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 04, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 04, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • May 03, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 24, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 14, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 05, 2018: [Furlough]
  • September 04, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 04, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 20, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 07, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 25, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 20, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 20, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 20, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 07, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 07, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order]
  • February 22, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 21, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Request]
  • February 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 16, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • February 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 16, 2018: [Request]
  • February 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 16, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 16, 2018: [Arrest]
  • February 16, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 16, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.