U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez-Yat
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 30, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 30, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 30, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 24, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 04, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 07, 2018: [Discovery]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Response]
  • February 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2018: [Request]
  • February 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 16, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • February 15, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 15, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 15, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 15, 2018: [Arrest]
  • February 15, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 15, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.