U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kersten
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • January 03, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 23, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • April 21, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 18, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 17, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 10, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 10, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 04, 2018: [Extend]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 27, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 23, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • August 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 21, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 09, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 02, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 02, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 02, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 15, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order]
  • February 27, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 21, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 20, 2018: [Request]
  • February 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 16, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 16, 2018: [Arrest]
  • February 16, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 16, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 16, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.