U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burning Breast et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 11, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 07, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 23, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 21, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 18, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • August 18, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 18, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 18, 2022: [Text Order of Detention]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 15, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 23, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 17, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 26, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • November 26, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 15, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 31, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 31, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 30, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 29, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 27, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 27, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 03, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 09, 2018: [Request]
  • May 09, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 09, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 01, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 13, 2018: [Request]
  • April 13, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 12, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 12, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 12, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 12, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 11, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 11, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2018: [Request]
  • April 10, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 09, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 02, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.