U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 02, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 13, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 12, 2022: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 12, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 01, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 17, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 17, 2021: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 17, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 03, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 03, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 03, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 18, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 07, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 19, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 19, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 15, 2019: [Extend]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 01, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 09, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 21, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 22, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 14, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 14, 2018: [Supplement]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 13, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • June 08, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 25, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 24, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 12, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 12, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 12, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 12, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2018: [Request]
  • April 12, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 05, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.