U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Farmer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 21, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 04, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 09, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 30, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 16, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 28, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 27, 2021: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 25, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 19, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 19, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 04, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 08, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 08, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 18, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 18, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • December 18, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • December 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 18, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 12, 2019: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 18, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 10, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 10, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 21, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 21, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 17, 2018: [Extend]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 23, 2018: [Consent]
  • July 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Consent]
  • April 25, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order]
  • March 28, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 20, 2018: [Request]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 16, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 16, 2018: [Arrest]
  • March 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 16, 2018: [Request]
  • March 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • March 16, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 16, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 16, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.