U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gary
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 01, 2025: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • April 29, 2025: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 05, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 04, 2019: [Exhibit List]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Notice]
  • February 27, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 27, 2019: [Witness List]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 16, 2019: [Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 06, 2018: [Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 24, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 12, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 06, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 06, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 06, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 23, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • May 16, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • May 15, 2018: [Bail Report]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 23, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 20, 2018: [Request]
  • February 20, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • February 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 16, 2018: [Request]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 16, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 16, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 16, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 16, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 16, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.