U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Condon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • January 04, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 12, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • March 12, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 06, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 06, 2018: [Sentencing]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 24, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 24, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 09, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 09, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 06, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 03, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 02, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 18, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • June 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • May 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 22, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 11, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 11, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 08, 2018: [Certificate]
  • May 07, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 23, 2018: [Consent]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 23, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 23, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 23, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 22, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 21, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [Request]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 16, 2018: [Arrest]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 16, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 16, 2018: [Request]
  • February 16, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 16, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.