U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Charging Elk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 09, 2020: [Forfeiture]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 18, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 07, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 07, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
  • August 27, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 21, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 28, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • June 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 15, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 15, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 15, 2018: [Extend]
  • June 15, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 29, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 29, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Request]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • February 20, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 16, 2018: [Request]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 16, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 16, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 16, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 16, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.