U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Laroche
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • May 03, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 03, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • May 03, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • May 03, 2018: [Verdict]
  • May 03, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 03, 2018: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • May 02, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 02, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • May 02, 2018: [Jury List]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 30, 2018: [In Limine]
  • April 30, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 27, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 27, 2018: [Witness List]
  • April 23, 2018: [Notice]
  • April 23, 2018: [Search/Seizure/Tracking Device Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 19, 2018: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • April 19, 2018: [Application for Search/Seizure/Tracking Device Warrant]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 27, 2018: [Order]
  • February 27, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 23, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 23, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 23, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 23, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 23, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 23, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 23, 2018: [Arrest]
  • February 23, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 23, 2018: [Request]
  • February 23, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.