U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gunville
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
  • March 18, 2021: [Receipt for Payment]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Request for Earned Pro-Social Time Off of Supervision]
  • November 22, 2019: [Request for Earned Pro-Social Time Off of Supervision]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 24, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 23, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • July 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 12, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 03, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 14, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 30, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 30, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 09, 2018: [Consent]
  • April 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Order]
  • March 02, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • March 02, 2018: [Request]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 27, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 23, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 23, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 23, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 23, 2018: [Arrest]
  • February 23, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 23, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 23, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.