U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Curley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 23, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 23, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 18, 2018: [Extend]
  • July 10, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 10, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 10, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 14, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 08, 2018: [Furlough]
  • June 04, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • April 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 25, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 25, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Order]
  • March 08, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • March 02, 2018: [Request]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 22, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 22, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2018: [Arrest]
  • February 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 21, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 21, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 20, 2018: [Request]
  • February 16, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 16, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.