U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Neck
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 26, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 26, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 26, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 24, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • June 11, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 03, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 22, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 22, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 22, 2019: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 01, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 05, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 04, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 03, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 04, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 29, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 29, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 29, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 29, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order]
  • February 28, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 27, 2018: [Request]
  • February 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 26, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 26, 2018: [Request]
  • February 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 26, 2018: [Arrest]
  • February 26, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 26, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 26, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.