U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. World Turner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 25, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 25, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 20, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 20, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 20, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 13, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 06, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 14, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 14, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 13, 2020: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • February 13, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • February 12, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 12, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 12, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 12, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 12, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 07, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 25, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 25, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 19, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 19, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 19, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 12, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 22, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 10, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 10, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 10, 2018: [Consent]
  • April 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 03, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 03, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order]
  • February 27, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 23, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 23, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 23, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 23, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 23, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 23, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • February 22, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 22, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 22, 2018: [Request]
  • February 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 22, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.