U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crazy Bull
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 23, 2023: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 18, 2023: [Text Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2023: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 05, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 05, 2023: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 05, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 05, 2023: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 05, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order of Detention]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 17, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 12, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 28, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 27, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 27, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 12, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 16, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 09, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 09, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 09, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order]
  • February 27, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 27, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 23, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 23, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 23, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 23, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • February 22, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 22, 2018: [Request]
  • February 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 22, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.