U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Touche
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 11, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 11, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 28, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 27, 2018: [Extend]
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 11, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 10, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 10, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 10, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 09, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 02, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 02, 2018: [Status Conference]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • September 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 13, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 13, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 25, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 25, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 29, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 02, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order]
  • February 27, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 27, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 23, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 23, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 23, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 23, 2018: [Arrest]
  • February 23, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2018: [Request]
  • February 22, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 22, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.