U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. O'Leary et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 14, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 13, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • May 13, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 03, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 03, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 03, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 26, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 19, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 05, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 02, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2019: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 05, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 19, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 19, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • February 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 11, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 28, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 07, 2019: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 04, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 18, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 18, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 26, 2018: [Consent]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 05, 2018: [Consent]
  • September 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 06, 2018: [Certificate]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 09, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 09, 2018: [Consent]
  • July 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 03, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 14, 2018: [Request]
  • March 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 02, 2018: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • March 02, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • February 26, 2018: [Order]
  • February 22, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 22, 2018: [Request]
  • February 22, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 21, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 21, 2018: [Request]
  • February 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 19, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 19, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 16, 2018: [Release from Custody]
  • February 16, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • February 15, 2018: [Release from Custody]
  • February 15, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 15, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 15, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 15, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 15, 2018: [Arrest]
  • February 15, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 15, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 15, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.