U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30013-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Colombe et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Appeal Record Returned]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 30, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 30, 2020: [USCA Opinion]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 25, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 25, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 22, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • February 19, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • February 18, 2019: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • February 18, 2019: [Transcript]
  • February 08, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 07, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 07, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 07, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 05, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 01, 2019: [Objection]
  • February 01, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 01, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 01, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 29, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 25, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 24, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 23, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 23, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 10, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 08, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • January 08, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 20, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 19, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 19, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 19, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 18, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 18, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 18, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 18, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [Transcript]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • November 05, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • November 05, 2018: [Verdict]
  • November 05, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • November 05, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • November 02, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 01, 2018: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 31, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 30, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 30, 2018: [Jury List]
  • October 30, 2018: [Witness List]
  • October 29, 2018: [In Limine]
  • October 29, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 29, 2018: [Witness List]
  • October 29, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • October 29, 2018: [Joinder]
  • October 27, 2018: [Joinder]
  • October 26, 2018: [Joinder]
  • October 26, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 26, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • October 26, 2018: [Witness List]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 24, 2018: [In Limine]
  • October 24, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 24, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • October 24, 2018: [Request]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • October 24, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 24, 2018: [Joinder]
  • October 23, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 23, 2018: [Reply]
  • October 23, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 22, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 22, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 22, 2018: [In Limine]
  • October 22, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 19, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 19, 2018: [In Limine]
  • October 19, 2018: [Witness List]
  • October 19, 2018: [Notice]
  • October 19, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 19, 2018: [Response]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2018: [Sever Defendant]
  • October 18, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 17, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 17, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 16, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 16, 2018: [Sever Defendant]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • October 10, 2018: [Jury List]
  • October 05, 2018: [Jury List]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • October 02, 2018: [Jury List]
  • October 01, 2018: [Jury List]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 25, 2018: [Consent]
  • July 23, 2018: [Consent]
  • July 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 20, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 13, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2018: [Consent]
  • July 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 21, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 19, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 19, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 19, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 18, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 18, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 25, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 22, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 21, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • May 17, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 09, 2018: [Transcript]
  • May 08, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 08, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 08, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 07, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Stipulation]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 20, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 19, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 14, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order]
  • March 12, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 05, 2018: [Suppress]
  • March 05, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • March 01, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 26, 2018: [Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 16, 2018: [Response]
  • February 16, 2018: [Request]
  • February 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 15, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 15, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 15, 2018: [Request]
  • February 15, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 14, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 14, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 14, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 14, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 14, 2018: [Release from Custody]
  • February 14, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 14, 2018: [Arrest]
  • February 14, 2018: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.