U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50034
  • Case Name: Sunny Kae Young
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
February, 2018
  • February 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.