U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cv-05016
  • Case Name: Holtry v. Dooley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 03, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 26, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • March 13, 2018: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • March 13, 2018: [Brief]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Letter Sent]
  • February 23, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 23, 2018: [Discovery]
  • February 23, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 23, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 23, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2241) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.