U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10017
  • Case Name: Jeffrey Christ Brockel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • March 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismissing Case]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Show Cause in Lieu of Dismissal]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • February 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • February 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.