U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40068
  • Case Name: Michael Wayne Russell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • August 06, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • August 06, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • June 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Case (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • June 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 06, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • August 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • May 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Intention]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.