U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40072
  • Case Name: Joshua Alan Thompson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Status Report]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
March, 2018
  • March 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Show Cause]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Affidavit of Default]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Corrective Entry]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.