U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-04026
  • Case Name: Thompson v. Young et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • May 09, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Response]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 20, 2018: [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • May 30, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • April 27, 2018: [Letter Sent]
  • April 27, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 27, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 26, 2018: [Supplement]
  • March 19, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 13, 2018: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • March 13, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 13, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 01, 2018: [Letter Sent]
  • March 01, 2018: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.