U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30011
  • Case Name: Hardes Partnership
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Exhibits Destroyed]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • February 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
October, 2020
  • October 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (Text Entry)]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
April, 2020
  • April 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • April 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Adversary Case]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdraw Proof of Claim]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdraw Proof of Claim]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Complaint]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Complaint]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Report of Sale]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Report of Sale]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Proof of Claim]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Filing Proof of Claim]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Support Document]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property From Debtor(s)]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Professional]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Professional]
  • February 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Professional]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Trustee Following Conversion (Text Order)]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee's Final Report Following Conversion]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Abandonment, Compel Trustee and Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document]
  • December 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice Appointing Successor Trustee]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Appointment Rejection]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Appointment Rejection]
  • December 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Transcript]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Transcript]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Convert Case 11 to 7]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Convert Case 11 to 7]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Transcript]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request for Transcript]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request for Transcript]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Convert Chapter 11 to 7 (fee required)]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Appointment Acceptance]
  • September 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Court's Exhibit and Witness List]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Brief]
  • September 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
August, 2018
  • August 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Return of Service ]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Nonstandard Order]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Abandonment, Compel and Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice (Nonstandard)(deactivated)]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice (Nonstandard)]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appoint Trustee (Ch 11)]
July, 2018
  • July 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reject Lease or Executory Contract]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order Request]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Sample Ballot Form]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Form (Sample)]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Disclosure Statement]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Plan]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reject Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Claim]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Transcript]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Court's Exhibit and Witness List]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Request for Transcript]
  • May 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Transcript]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Deadlines]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Request for Transcript]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Transcript]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Court's Exhibit and Witness List]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Request for Transcript]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Brief]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Transcript (First Meeting of Creditors)]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Conclusion]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Evidentiary Hearing]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [List of Equity Security Holders]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • March 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Report of Inability to Appoint Creditors' Committee]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Authority to File - Ch 11]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.