U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10024
  • Case Name: Jason Orthaus and Jill Anita Orthaus
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Audio of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Exhibits Destroyed]
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 12 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Case (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Joinder]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Court's Exhibit and Witness List]
April, 2019
  • April 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (no waiver) (fee required)]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Stipulated Facts]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Brief]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
March, 2019
  • March 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Order Request]
  • February 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • November 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Affidavit of Default]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reply]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • October 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • September 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • August 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline(s)]
July, 2018
  • July 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transcript (Depositions and 2004 Exams Only)]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Brief]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • June 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
May, 2018
  • May 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Affidavit]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • March 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.