U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-01006
  • Case Name: Maxfield v. Larson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 28, 2021: [Dismiss]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • May 25, 2021: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • May 25, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 25, 2021: [Response]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 22, 2021: [Extend]
  • April 20, 2021: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 20, 2021: [Statement of Material Facts (attorney use)]
  • April 20, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • April 20, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 20, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 20, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 07, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 04, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 15, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 03, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 02, 2020: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • March 02, 2020: [Leave to]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 12, 2019: [Letter Received]
  • December 09, 2019: [Letter Received]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 24, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 24, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2019: [Compel]
  • May 02, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2019: [Discovery]
  • April 24, 2019: [Compel]
  • April 19, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2019: [Discovery]
  • April 12, 2019: [Supplement]
  • April 08, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 02, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2019: [Reconsideration]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • March 28, 2019: [Response]
  • March 27, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2019: [Leave to]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 20, 2019: [Strike]
  • March 14, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2019: [Leave to]
  • March 14, 2019: [Compel]
  • March 14, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 14, 2019: [Order]
  • March 14, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 13, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • March 12, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 04, 2019: [Response to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Compel]
  • February 27, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 22, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 21, 2019: [Discovery]
  • February 14, 2019: [Supplement]
  • February 07, 2019: [Letter Received]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 04, 2019: [Request]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 07, 2018: [Strike]
  • December 04, 2018: [Response]
  • December 04, 2018: [Letter Received]
November, 2018
  • November 23, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 19, 2018: [Declaration]
  • November 19, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 19, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 16, 2018: [Supplement]
  • November 13, 2018: [Supplement]
  • November 08, 2018: [Supplement]
  • November 08, 2018: [Request]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2018: [Letter Received]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 29, 2018: [Supplement]
  • October 19, 2018: [Letter Received]
  • October 17, 2018: [Response]
  • October 15, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 15, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 05, 2018: [Brief]
  • October 04, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Letter Received]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 13, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 06, 2018: [Letter Received]
  • August 06, 2018: [Supplement]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 27, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 20, 2018: [Mail Returned]
  • July 17, 2018: [Supplement]
  • July 17, 2018: [Notice]
  • July 17, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 09, 2018: [Extend]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 26, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 26, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 25, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 25, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • June 15, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 07, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • May 09, 2018: [Letter Sent]
  • May 09, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 04, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 24, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 20, 2018: [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
  • April 18, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 02, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 29, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 23, 2018: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • March 23, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 23, 2018: [Supplement]
  • March 20, 2018: [Supplement]
  • March 13, 2018: [Letter Sent]
  • March 13, 2018: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.