U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mack
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 02, 2025: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 17, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 22, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 15, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 11, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 27, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 16, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 19, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 11, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 16, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 07, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 07, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 19, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 24, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 24, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 24, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 24, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 24, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 23, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 23, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 23, 2018: [Request]
  • May 23, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.