U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-10007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Figueroa-Serrano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Appeal Record Returned]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • December 07, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • December 07, 2020: [Forfeiture]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 24, 2020: [USCA Opinion]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • August 05, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 05, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • August 02, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 01, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 25, 2019: [Declaration of Publication]
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice]
  • July 23, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 23, 2019: [Sentencing]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 03, 2019: [Continue]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 22, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • January 03, 2019: [Forfeiture]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 03, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 16, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 16, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 14, 2018: [Extend]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 10, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • October 09, 2018: [Supplement]
  • October 09, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 05, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 04, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 01, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 27, 2018: [Extend]
  • September 24, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 20, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 20, 2018: [Transcript]
  • September 12, 2018: [Waiver]
  • September 05, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 05, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • September 05, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • August 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 10, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 26, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 26, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 26, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 26, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 18, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 15, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 12, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 12, 2018: [Suppress]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Order]
  • April 10, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 06, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 02, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 26, 2018: [Response]
  • March 23, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 22, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • March 22, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 22, 2018: [Request]
  • March 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • March 14, 2018: [Quash]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 14, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 14, 2018: [Complaint]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.