U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morrisette
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 22, 2019: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 17, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • October 10, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 10, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 30, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 30, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 30, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 20, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 19, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 19, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • March 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 11, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2019: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • March 07, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 25, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 21, 2018: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • December 21, 2018: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 21, 2018: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • December 21, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 21, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 28, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 28, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Order]
  • July 26, 2018: [Request]
  • July 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 26, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 25, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • July 25, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 25, 2018: [Request]
  • July 24, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 23, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 19, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 18, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 18, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 17, 2018: [Arrest]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 14, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.